MYOTUBULAR TRUST

Charity number: 1113809
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds to find a cure for Myotubular Myopathy. As of 30th September 2010, this charity number is no longer active. It has been incorporated and a new charity number issued. Please see charity number 1137177. The name, activities and all assets and liablities have been transferred entirely to the new entity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 2006: Standard registration
  • 11 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 11 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1137177 MYOTUBULAR TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required