CITIZENS ADVICE - HART DISTRICT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing free, confidential, independent and impartial advice for members of the public in Hart District. It operates from one main centre in Fleet and outreach venues in Yateley, Hartley Wintney and Odiham. Advice is delivered by phone, email, online and face to face. Specialist services include advice on debt, employment, relationships, housing, benefits, energy and consumer issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £224,286 from 4 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
59 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 April 2006: Standard registration
- 09 May 2025: Funds received from 202316 FLEET, CRONDALL AND CROOKHAM WELFARE TRUST
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nicholls | Chair | 28 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Philippa Reader | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Nel | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Callaghan | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Angela Rayment | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Zachery Coffin | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Bambridge | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Surrall | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Durdle | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ellis Stern | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.41k | £406.81k | £404.15k | £384.07k | £478.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345.29k | £371.18k | £394.35k | £371.48k | £404.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £170.63k | £155.13k | £153.13k | £210.66k | £224.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MARCH 2006 as amended on 28 Mar 2018 as amended on 11 May 2023
Charitable objects
4. The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in Hart District and surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
HART DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Citizens Advice Hart
Civic Offices
Harlington Way
FLEET
Hampshire
GU51 4AE
- Phone:
- 01252878435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window