SUPPORTERS OF FERRING SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1123683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To organise and raise funds for the Primary School that we are the Supporters Association of.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £6,745
Total expenditure: £3,742

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 April 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SOFSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Zoe Foggett Chair 12 December 2022
None on record
Thomas Compton Trustee 28 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.14k £3.47k £4.88k £4.25k £6.75k
Total expenditure £3.23k £6.92k £5.25k £4.02k £3.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FERRING C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
SEA LANE
FERRING
WORTHING
BN12 5DU
Phone:
01903243945