Trustees OLD VILLAGE HALL CHARITY

Charity Number: 1115531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNN PILLEY Chair 08 May 2015
None on record
Susan Drabble Trustee 24 April 2025
None on record
Julie Afford Trustee 24 April 2025
None on record
Sonal Dearden Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
GRAEME JEFFREY STENNING CARR Trustee 16 May 2019
None on record
MICHAEL FREDERICK JONES Trustee 17 January 2013
None on record
Dr KATHLEEN MARY LINDENBAUM Trustee
None on record