RECOVERY EMPOWERMENT NETWORKING AND EMPLOYMENT FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION (RENEW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RENEW is currently providing a wide range of services to women in prostitution in Angeles City, Philippines, and women at risk of prostitution or trafficking in the Philippines and across South East Asia. Women wanting to leave prostitution or trafficked situations are offered medical care as well as opportunities for counselling, training and spiritual renewal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Philippines
Governance
- 14 August 2006: Standard registration
- RENEW (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSHUA WILLIAM SHUBRA HORDERN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Boland | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE HORDERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTORIA ALISON HORDERN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.70k | £9.58k | £6.55k | £5.90k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.69k | £6.37k | £6.26k | £7.43k | £8.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 MARCH 2006 AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT 8 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST WOMEN, GIRLS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE PHILIPPINES WHO ARE AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM SEXUAL EXPLOITATION, TRAFFICKING OR VIOLENCE THROUGH PROSTITUTION, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF, BUT NO EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH SERVICES AS ADVICE AND SUPPORT, SIGNPOSTING, EDUCATION, COUNSELLING AND SAFE ACCOMMODATION. 2. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT PROSTITUTION AND ITS IMPACT ON INDIVIDUALS AND SOCIETY IN GENERAL AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR WOMEN. 3. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG WOMEN WORKING IN PROSTITUTION IN THE PHILIPPINES AND AMONGST THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
PHILIPPINES
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Glanville Road
Oxford
OX4 2DD
- Phone:
- 01865778453
- Email:
- joshuahordern@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window