Accounts and annual returns SOS POLONIA

Charity Number: 1115111
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 August 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 May 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 May 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window