Financial history SOS POLONIA

Charity number: 1115111
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £59.81k £50.22k £18.60k £4.00k £6.00k
Total expenditure £57.95k £54.16k £11.93k £7.91k £4.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.36k N/A £3 N/A N/A