THE FRIENDS OF NURSTEED COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS OF NURSTEED COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 May 2006: Standard registration
- FONCPS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARE LOUISE OATLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma-Jayne Louise Buxton | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Payne | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
AMY JONES | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ben Stockley | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATE SAULT | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Stockley | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Stockley | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MAUND | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH RALPH CHIVERS | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE DOWDESWELL | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI JENNIFER BOOTHER | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE BOGERT | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PENNY STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON LOUISE CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIAN LOUISE COLLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.89k | £4.26k | £4.09k | £5.53k | £5.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.57k | £5.87k | £5.10k | £4.81k | £2.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1559 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE DEVIZES, WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
149 BRICKLEY LANE
DEVIZES
SN10 3BL
- Phone:
- 07779113542
- Email:
- coatley@live.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window