GREAT RISSINGTON RECREATION & SPORTS COMMUNITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support fund raising activities to provide and improve recreational and sports facilities in the village of Great Rissington to cater for the changing needs of the village and wider local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 July 2006: Standard registration
- GRRSCF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Stafford | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Melchoir | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemina Roseanne Bailey Plater | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Anthony Wernick | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Blessley | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.24k | £5.98k | £5.42k | £5.43k | £5.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06k | £14.82k | £5.55k | £5.25k | £5.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT RISSINGTON, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OFF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (2) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREAT RISSINGTON, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET, FOOTBALL AND OTHER HEALTHY SPORTS.
Area of benefit
GREAT RISSINGTON, GLOUCESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Annexe, Blue Close Bungalow
Rectory Lane
Great Rissington
CHELTENHAM
GL54 2LL
- Phone:
- 01451 605005
- Email:
- grrscf@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window