Financial history BODY OF CHRIST MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity number: 1120621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26.08k £17.20k £13.85k £14.91k £11.58k
Total expenditure £25.79k £13.49k £12.41k £12.22k £12.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A