Accounts and annual returns EAST AFRICAN COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity number: 1114651
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 13 October 2008 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 03 April 2008 On Time