BETH HAMEDRASH KINGSLEY WAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Further the advancement of the Orthodox Jewish religion and Orthodox Jewish education. Supporting and maintaning the Synagogue and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £4,840 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 21 April 2006: Standard registration
- BETH HAMEDRASH KINGSLEY WAT TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY KEVAN FEHLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELI LAZAR | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEREMY SIMON TRAVERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.39k | £80.54k | £83.00k | £70.78k | £79.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.15k | £83.89k | £80.96k | £73.39k | £79.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.36k | £3.69k | £3.62k | £4.08k | £4.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 March 2022 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 March 2022 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 October 2020 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
A] THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION, ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR - BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY - BY SUPPORTING AND MAINTAINING THE SYNAGOGUE. B] THE TRUSTEES' SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME, UPON TRUST, TO APPLY ALL OR PART(S) OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIMES AND MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES' MAY - IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION- THINK FIT, TOWARDS THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (INCLUDING PAYMENTS BY THE WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN, WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST, TO INDIVIDUAL PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, PROVIDED THAT SUCH PERSONS QUALIFY AS THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES OF THE SYNAGOGUE AS DETERMINED BY ENGLISH LAW).E, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY, PERSON OR BODY, IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS. C] TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 St. Georges Road
London
NW11 0LU
- Phone:
- 0208 7318179
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window