ENGINEERING FORUM OF NIGERIANS (EFN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE AND PEOPLE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS IN THE UK AND NIGERIA IN THE SUBJECT OF ENGINEERING AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE UK, EUROPE AND WORLDWIDE IN SUPPORT OF SUCH AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 13 February 2007: Standard registration
- EFN (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ezinne Ogbonna | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Boma Douglas | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|||||
PATRICE CHUKWUEMEKA OKARO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOJEED DAWODU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADESEYI SIJUWADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £787 | £611 | £1.11k | £1.35k | £1.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £641 | £1.21k | £529 | £1.42k | £252 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 06 October 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE AND PEOPLE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS IN THE UK AND NIGERIA IN THE SUBJECT OF ENGINEERING AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE UK, EUROPE AND WORLDWIDE IN SUPPORT OF SUCH AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
UK, NIGERIA AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE EFN SECRETARIAT
468 Watford Way
Mill Hill
LONDON
NW7 2QB
- Phone:
- 07949732978
- Email:
- secretariat@efn.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window