THE COUNTRYSIDE ALLIANCE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the conservation, protection and improvement of the environment Supporting conservation projects that protect flora and fauna in the British countryside Educating the public in subjects relating to the conservation, protection and enjoyment of the countryside Promoting sustainable development through research and the prudent use of natural resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 2007: Standard registration
- 20 January 2016: Funds received from 1135140 CASTING FOR RECOVERY UK & IRELAND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Dale Glover | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Caroline Reynard | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lord Nicholas Herbert | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Karen Silcock | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.80k | £141.41k | £252.62k | £223.37k | £325.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £316.03k | £194.72k | £233.86k | £222.76k | £330.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 AUGUST 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY SUPPORTING ACCESS AND CONSERVATION PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES THAT PROTECT FEATURES OF WILDLIFE, FLORA AND FAUNA IN THE BRITISH COUNTRYSIDE GENERALLY AND RESPONSIBLE AND SUSTAINABLE USE OF THESE ENVIRONMENTS. 3.2. TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3.3. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS PERTAINING TO THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE COUNTRYSIDE. 3.4. THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: 3.4.1. THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; 3.4.2. THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; AND 3.4.3. CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS”. 3.5. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; 3.6 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR AND THE ORGANISING OF OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES THAT ARE CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
China Works
Black Prince Road
Vauxhall
LONDON
SE1 7SJ
- Phone:
- 02078409212
- Email:
- info@ca-foundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window