Accounts and annual returns THE C ALMA BAKER TRUST

Charity number: 1113864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 15 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 April 2023 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 March 2023 150 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 April 2022 341 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 14 December 2021 228 days late Download Open in new window