Financial history THE C ALMA BAKER TRUST

Charity number: 1113864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.21m £362.92k £12.11k £14.73k £14.51k
Total expenditure £2.11m £395.98k £10.85k £25.47k £46.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £2.05m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £29.11k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £122.98k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £86.74k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.83k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £9.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £2.02m N/A N/A N/A N/A