Financial history LIFE CHANGES COUNSELLING

Charity Number: 1114553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.87k £31.27k £20.90k £62.07k £123.34k
Total expenditure £31.79k £30.31k £31.15k £66.65k £121.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.50k N/A £12.69k N/A