MURTON RECREATIONAL AND VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Murton recreational and village hall trust maintains its building and its lands for the benefit of local residents for recreation, education and social welfare making available its facilities both indoor and outdoor for the promotion of these purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 16 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOAN LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH EDWARD MARSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IONA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.53k | £9.53k | £7.90k | £9.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.23k | £9.36k | £7.79k | £9.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1204 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1569 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1569 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
1) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA ADMINISTERED BY BISHOPSTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS 2) THE OBJECT OF THE MURTON CHARITY IS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA ADMINISTERED BY BISHOPSTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
AREA ADMINISTERED BY BISHOPSTON COMMUNITY COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window