MIRACLE LIFE GOSPEL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Some objectives of the Church are: To encourage and promote evangelism by proclaiming the Gospel of Jesus Christ. To provide a forum for fellowship among Christians of like faith. To assist the poor and the needy within and outside of the church. To support schools, hospitals, and other institutions. To encourage and assist in development programmes for people living in deprived areas. Etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
- Ghana
Governance
- 11 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GORDON AGUDEY KISSEIH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH SOWA OKPOTI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.79k | £1.39k | £2.13k | £848 | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.33k | £776 | £1.02k | £3.52k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 December 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED IN MINUTES DATED 17 JUNE 2006 AND 27 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
ARTICLE 3. AIMS AND OBJECTIVES: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF FAITH AT ARTICLE 4.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 OLAF PLACE
COVENTRY
CV2 2DG
- Phone:
- 07983015624
- Email:
- mlgcukcov@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window