THE MARLBOROUGH CONCERT ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music and Music education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 April 2006: Standard registration
- MCO (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Ann Maria Sancto | Chair | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Victor Edwards | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Terry-Brown | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynn Williamson | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Stephen Vincent | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Buckley | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Diana Smith | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.02k | £570 | £7.15k | £8.80k | £9.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.27k | £1.14k | £6.95k | £8.09k | £9.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 06 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC ORCHESTRAL CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
MARLBOROUGH, WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Moss Mead
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN14 0TN
- Phone:
- 01249444161
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
mco.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window