OXBRIDGE N I H TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 April 2006: Standard registration
- 28 September 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 09 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 29 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 02 September 2008 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ENGAGED IN POST GRADUATE STUDIES AND RESEARCH IN BIOMEDICAL SCIENCE AND RELATED DISCIPLINES AT THE UNIVERSITIES OF OXFORD AND CAMBRIDGE AND OTHER INSTITUTIONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD ("THE INSTITUTIONS") FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (1) PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, PRIZES OR BURSARIES; AND (2) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF BIOMEDICAL, MEDICAL, SURGICAL AND OTHER EQUIPMENT TO THE INSTITUTIONS; AND (3) BY SUCH OTHER METHODS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window