DENE COURT HAMSTERLEY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LOCAL AREA BY PROVIDING FACILITIES TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE PURSUITS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 19 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Ian W Waugh | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MARY MALLOY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.78k | £22.54k | £9.10k | £1.70k | £1.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.60k | £1.35k | £1.35k | £2.15k | £1.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 20 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LOCAL AREA BY PROVIDING FACILITIES TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE PURSUITS AND 2. TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE DENE COURT COMMUNAL ROOM, AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE ROOM FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HAMSTERLEY COLLIERY, COUNTY DURHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Summerfield Terrace
Low Westwood
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE17 7PR
- Phone:
- 01207562502
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window