THE BRENDAN OAKES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping teenagers undergoing treatment for cancer to have fun. Provision of laptop computers for study and social networking whilst in hospital. Helping NHS Trusts to furnish their teenage and young people projects with electrical equipment, furniture, computer games and media equipment. Helping individuals to enjoy trips to London shows, river cruises and silverstone circuits events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Lincolnshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANTHONY OAKES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Heather Louise Elvin | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN GARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE JANE OAKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.41k | £65 | £884 | £3.59k | £3.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £500 | £2.15k | £216 | £2.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CANCER, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 STOCKTON CLOSE
HADLEIGH
IPSWICH
IP7 5SH
- Phone:
- 01473828640
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window