HOME EDUCATION UK LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home Education UK is a charity that supports home-educated children and their families. It puts on an ever-expanding range of practical activities for children to participate in including football, dance, drama, tennis and judo. The charity supplies home-educating families and members of the general public with relevant information on all aspects of home education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 2006: Standard registration
- 20 August 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.02k | £2.86k | £8.44k | £10.69k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £2.86k | £10.22k | £8.98k | £8.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | 18 August 2015 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | 03 March 2014 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | 24 January 2013 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HOME-EDUCATED CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, RESOURCES, FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION FOR BOTH THEM AND THEIR PARENTS. B TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS PERTAINING TO HOME EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window