Pro Dogs Direct
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
rescue, rehabiltate and rehome
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 August 2006: Standard registration
- PRO DOGS DIRECT REHOMING (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johana Morris | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
DONNA WOODFORD | Trustee | 19 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAT BRYANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.41k | £166.56k | £178.85k | £186.48k | £212.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.07k | £99.39k | £135.27k | £162.61k | £152.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 2006 as amended on 02 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CARE AND TREATMENT AND ALSO BY HELPING TO FIND THEM NEW HOMES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONCERNING THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF DOGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Cole Avenue
Aldershot
GU11 1AN
- Phone:
- 07766 021 465
- Email:
- Info@ProDogsDirect.Org.Uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window