YAFA WELFARE ASSOCIATION IN WEST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Yafa Welfare Association strives to raise the quality of life of the Yafai community of Birmingham and the wider community through the delivery of services and educational activities in partnership with other organisations. We promote Yafai culture and values, working towards a seamless multicultural society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2020
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 08 May 2006: Standard registration
- YAFA WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMED FADHLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDULFATAH ABDULRHAMAN JURAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABBAS MOTLAK MOTHEA DHALAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUKHTAR SALEH MOHAMMED JURAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMIN HARHARA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR F HARHARA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 768 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1133 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1133 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED: TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEST MIDLANDS, THE YAFA COMMUNITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
393 COVENTRY ROAD
SMALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B10 0SP
- Phone:
- 01217727602
- Email:
- leverastar@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window