YORKSHIRE AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST CHARITIES

Charity Number: 1114106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Apply income for any charitable purpose relating to NHS wholly or mainly for the services provided by Yorkshire Ambulance Service NHS Trust

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £304,762
Total expenditure: £409,536

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley
  • Bradford City
  • City Of Wakefield
  • City Of York
  • Doncaster
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire
  • Leeds City
  • North Yorkshire
  • Rotherham
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TEES EAST AND NORTH YORKSHIRE AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yorkshire Ambulance Service NHS Trust Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £210.56k £328.68k £702.24k £149.80k £304.76k
Total expenditure £177.17k £263.72k £287.55k £355.30k £409.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £652.30k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £27.40k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £20.56k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.97k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £125.11k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £216.21k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £71.35k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE YORKSHIRE AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 09 May 2006 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Yorkshire Ambulance Service
Springhill
2 Brindley Way
Wakefield 41 Industrial Estate
WAKEFIELD
WF2 0XQ
Phone:
01924 584369