Accounts and annual returns THE KINGDOM OF JESUS CHRIST THE NAME ABOVE EVERY NAME

Charity number: 1114048
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
Annual return 01 June 2023 17 May 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 17 May 2024 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2022 27 July 2023 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2021 14 April 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 14 April 2022 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2020 14 April 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 14 April 2021 13 days late Download Open in new window