THE KINGDOM OF JESUS CHRIST THE NAME ABOVE EVERY NAME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HOLY BIBLE THROUGH SERIES OF BIBLE STUDIES, LESSONS AND COUNSELLING, TO STRENGTHEN AND REHABILITATE LIVES. KJC SUPPORTS VARIOUS PROJECTS FROM YOUTH GROUPS AND ASSISTING SENIORS, LOW-INCOME FAMILIES, LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND OVERSEAS TO POVERTY STRICKEN COUNTRIES. WE ARE HERE TO BRING PEOPLE TOGETHER, LINKING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Bristol City
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Philippines
Governance
- 05 May 2006: Standard registration
- KJC (Working name)
- THE KINGDOM OF JESUS CHRIST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIA ASUNCION SARABIA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Josephine Solis | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizarde | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JESUSA SAMBO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | 01/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.69k | £38.55k | £30.94k | £52.36k | £67.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.83k | £47.45k | £43.40k | £55.35k | £56.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | 14 April 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HOLY BIBLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM FIT. 2. TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED, SICK OR POOR, AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATIONS. 3. TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGDOM OF JESUS CHRIST
HQ
344-354 GRAYS INN ROAD
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02074439462
- Email:
- kjclondon@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window