ME TOO & CO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For children and young people with additional needs. We provide 2 play sessions weekly with toys, art activities, singing with Makaton; music therapy; communication group; an Osteopathy Clinic; support group for teenage girls with Asperger's. For parents we provide talks; Benefits Advice; SEN Advocacy; relaxation therapies & counselling. A parent forum influences the development of local services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 06 November 2006: Standard registration
- 12 November 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 12 November 2013: Funds transferred to 1148114 Skylarks Charity
- ME AND U (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.21k | £28.72k | £64.23k | £63.99k | £117.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.15k | £26.98k | £46.02k | £60.15k | £100.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 02 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 27 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 27 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 07 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 07 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS DUE TO PHYSICAL OR LEARNING IMPAIRMENT, EMOTIONAL OR BEHAVIOUR DIFFICULTIES OR ANY PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY ILLNESS, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND SURROUNDING AREAS, AND THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS AND SIBLINGS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window