THE CONSERVATION TRUST FOR ST LAURENCE LUDLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CONSERVATION TRUST PROMOTES REGULAR GIVING AND FUND RAISING EVENTS TO PROVIDE MONEY TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST LAURENCE, LUDLOW. THE FUNDS ARE GRANTED TO THE CHURCH PCC FOR ADMINISTRATION FOR SPECIFIC PROJECTS. THE TRUST IS SECULAR AND INDEPENDENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sebastian Bowen | Chair | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Grace Wilkins | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Peter Salter | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gabrielle Service | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eric Griffiths | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Andrew Hall | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dina Webb | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN MARSHALL | Trustee | 16 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Raymond-Blake | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Thwaites | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.46k | £74.85k | £22.20k | £23.02k | £29.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £8.01k | £6.59k | £1.39k | £10.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 APR 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 MAR 2012 as amended on 11 Nov 2019 as amended on 06 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL THEREOF IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES NAMELY: 3.1.1 TO MAINTAIN REPAIR RESTORE PRESERVE RECONSTRUCT BEAUTIFY AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH 3.1.2 FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THE TRUSTEES DECLARE THAT THEY DO NOT CLAIM AND WILL NOT SEEK ANY PROPRIETORIAL INTEREST IN THE CHURCH AND THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE SET OUT IN SUB-CLAUSE 3.1.1 ABOVE SUBJECT ONLY TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 14 HEREOF AND NOTHING HEREIN CONTAINED SHALL IN ANY WAY AFFECT OR PREJUDICE THE POWERS FUNCTIONS DUTIES OR LIABILITIES OF THE OWNER
Area of benefit
THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST LAURENCE LUDLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Conservation Trust for St Laurence
Parish Office
2 College Street
Ludlow
SY8 1AN
- Phone:
- 01584 878232
- Email:
- info@ludlowpalmers.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window