PRESTWOOD NATURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation of natural environment in the area up to 5km from Prestwood
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 15 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Matthews | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Marlow | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frances Caroline Rawle | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Appleby | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bunting | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen van Oostrum | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Griffiths | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18k | £2.44k | £1.00k | £1.27k | £6.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £762 | £695 | £932 | £3.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 4 NOVEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 2 NOVEMBER 2004 as amended on 01 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND ENHANCE THE QUALITY OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE PRESTWOOD AND KINGSHILL AREA THROUGH THE INVOLVEMENT OF LOCAL RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
PRESTWOOD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 New Road
Little Kingshill
GREAT MISSENDEN
Buckinghamshire
HP16 0EU
- Phone:
- 01494868138
- Email:
- admin@prestwoodnature.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window