CHURCH LANE (BEDFORD) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY IS VERY INVOLVED IN WORKING WITH LOCAL ORGANISATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE YOUTH OF THE AREA. WE APPLY FOR FUNDING TO HELP OUT ORGANISATIONS WHEN WE CAN. GOLDINGTON IS A DEPRIVED AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
Governance
- 31 May 2006: Standard registration
- CHURCH LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Augustine | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Randolph Manuel Augustine | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.11k | £44.09k | £35.09k | £63.21k | £56.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.22k | £46.21k | £46.27k | £51.98k | £78.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 2008 AND 8 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE GOLDINGTON ELECTORAL WARD OF BEDFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE CHURCH LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE, (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
THE GOLDINGTON ELECTORAL WARD OF BEDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
147 CHURCH LANE
BEDFORD
MK41 0PW
- Phone:
- 01234 270601
- Email:
- info@churchlanecentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window