Financial history THORNHILL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1122810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £322.41k £266.89k £284.37k £299.54k £321.69k
Total expenditure £312.83k £245.01k £269.58k £267.36k £314.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £77.97k £29.39k N/A £5.35k