CHIPPING NORTON LIDO LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Chipping Norton Lido is to promote the health and social welfare of all sections of the community, particularly the elderly and the young, in Chipping Norton and the surrounding areas by running an open air swimming pool providing healthy recreation, sports education and improvement of quality of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £6,100 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 24 April 2006: Standard registration
- CHIPPING NORTON LIDO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE VICTORIA JARVIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirsty Garrett | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hatherly | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Polly Jaffe | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Bland | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ALISON DAVIES | Trustee | 11 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUPERT BLAKELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN PETER NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.92k | £85.94k | £224.63k | £213.20k | £191.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.47k | £102.94k | £230.18k | £211.85k | £207.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.08k | £26.08k | £53.20k | £5.75k | £6.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHIPPING NORTON AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES THE PROVISION OF A LIDO (OPEN AIR HEATED SWIMMING POOL AND RECREATIONAL AREA) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF PROMOTING HEALTH TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE THROUGH ACCESS TO HEALTHY RECREATION AND SPORTS EDUCATION AND OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHIPPING NORTON AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Churchill Road
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 5HR
- Phone:
- 01608643230
- Email:
- info@chippylido.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window