SCDA (SOMALI COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT ASSOCATION)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run workshops, projects, entertainments to help young people to construct their future and stay away from things that would jeopardise their future. Hoping to create youth centres so young people can come to enjoy their social life as well as helping them construct their future by providing training to those who are not in education or employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 July 2006: Standard registration
- 03 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SOCDA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | 28/02/2013 | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.96k | £27.00k | £31.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.85k | £23.19k | £29.42k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST OF FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY , SICKNESS, DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WITHIN THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (LONDON, LOCAL AND SOMALIA) AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE GRANTS, ADVOCACY, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRANSLATION SERVICES. TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF THE SOMALI ORIGIN OR DESCENT WITH DRUG OR ALCOHOL ABUSE, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND COUNSELLING SERVICE. TO PROVIDE HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE AND REHABILITATION TO VICTIMS OF DISEASE, CATASTROPHE AND CONFLICT IN SOMALIA SPECIALLY ELDERLY PEOPLE, WOMEN AND CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
LOCAL - LONDON AND OVERSEAS PARTICULARLY SOMALIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window