SYCAMORE TRUST U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides support for people with Autistic Spectrum Disorders, Learning Difficulites and associated disorders, their carers and families through the provision of advice, advocacy,support, information and educational activities aiding them towards equal opportunities and social integrations. The charity also provides training to individuals and groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £166,420 from 7 government contract(s) and £12,142 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Redbridge
Governance
- 08 November 2006: Standard registration
- PARENT OF AUTISTIC CHILDREN TOGETHER IN BARKING & DAGENHAM (Previous name)
- PARENTS OF AUTISTIC CHILDREN TOGETHER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Hobson | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard George | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terry Hurley | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Allum | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ramandeep Kaur Basson | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Baty | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £497.38k | £555.82k | £493.30k | £420.79k | £348.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £525.53k | £473.68k | £486.26k | £481.41k | £449.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £192.50k | £184.41k | £140.60k | £153.27k | £166.42k | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.05k | N/A | £51.40k | £9.78k | £12.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £32.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £521.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £473.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £469.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS (ASD), LEARNING DISABILITIES AND RELATED DISORDERS, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, AIDING THEM TOWARDS EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES AND SOCIAL INTEGRATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. BARKING AND DAGENHAM. HAVERING. REDBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sycamore Trust UK
27-29 Woodward Road
DAGENHAM
RM9 4SJ
- Phone:
- 02085179317
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window