INTERFAITH WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Interfaith Wolverhampton aims to work with diverse communities living in Wolverhampton in order to foster and nurture mutual understanding and appreciation between the different faiths. It seeks to arrange, encourage and support dialogue between different faiths, communities and agencies so as to contribute to an environment of tolerance, mutual respect and harmony.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 May 2006: Standard registration
- WOLVERHAMPTON INTER-FAITH AND REGENERATION NETWORK (Previous name)
- WOLVERHAMPTON INTER-FAITH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- WOLVERHAMPTON INTER-FAITH GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hakeem Bakare | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ben Whitmore | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Basma Ikram | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Gilson | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|||||
JASBINDER DEHAR | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JILL PARKER | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
MARTIN GOMBERG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00k | £13.64k | £24.88k | £99.99k | £7.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.18k | £10.81k | £22.79k | £101.89k | £12.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £3.62k | £15.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £94.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JULY 1996 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2006, 1 OCTOBER 2008 AND 22 OCTOBER 2010. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2010 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/10/2014
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AIMED SPECIFICALLY AT KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF RELIGIOUS FAITHS WITH THE PURPOSE OF THE ENHANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY WITHIN THE CITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND ITS ENVIRONS. 2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY- = DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND ITS ENVIRONS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY BY: A) PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT ON HOW THEY IDENTIFY AND EVIDENCE NEEDS OR PRIORITIES OF THEIR COMMUNITY; HOW THEY PLAN PROJECTS; HOW THEY SOURCE APPROPRIATE FUNDING, IMPLEMENTATION AND SUSTAINABILITY B} SUPPORTING SPECIFIC PROJECTS THAT ARE OF BENEFIT TO THE COMMUNITY HELPING PEOPLE TO TAKE A FULL ROLE IN AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 3) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE-BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING AWARENESS AND KNOWLEDGE IN THE AREA OF ENERGY CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES, THEREBY ASSISTING IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Bartholomew's Church
57 Church Hill Road
Wolverhampton
WV4 5BJ
- Phone:
- 07853251929
- Email:
- admin@ifwton.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window