MARYPORT EDUCATIONAL SETTLEMENT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a centre at which men and women may find opportunities for arts and learning, fellowship and cooperative effort for the welfare of the community, which shall be open to all those who desire to learn, without any distinction of class, creed or politics, and also to promote such kindred and allied activities as shall by law be considered charitable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 May 2006: Standard registration
- 15 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MARYPORT EDUCATIONAL SETTLEMENT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 31/03/2017 | 31/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.16k | £54.34k | £55.68k | £55.00k | £12.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.51k | £69.63k | £65.05k | £116.58k | £290.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 21 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE A CENTRE AT WHICH MEN AND WOMEN WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF CLASS CREED OR POLITICS FIND OPPORTUNITIES FOR EDUCATION, FELLOWSHIP AND CO-OPERATIVE EFFORT FOR THE WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY (II) TO PROMOTE SUCH ALLIED ACTIVITIES AS SHALL BY LAW BE CONSIDERED CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE MARYPORT, CUMBRIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window