Financial history BICKINGTON VILLAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1115259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/02/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.61k £16.10k £21.71k £6.53k £13.84k
Total expenditure £28.66k £9.47k £7.11k £12.97k £16.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £15.38k £19.60k N/A £2.45k