BICKINGTON VILLAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities and amenities for the young, elderly and members of the community of Bickington and to raise funds for the facilities and amenities which support their activities undertaken within the Village Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,450 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 12 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Phillip Martin | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Briddock | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Louise Northmore | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Saunders | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Brewin | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil James Randle | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/02/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.61k | £16.10k | £21.71k | £6.53k | £13.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.66k | £9.47k | £7.11k | £12.97k | £16.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £15.38k | £19.60k | N/A | £2.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 February 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BICKINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (1) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (2) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BICKINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bickington Village Hall
Bickington
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 6JX
- Phone:
- 07743044212
- Email:
- jane.staveley@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window