Trustees THE READING HINDU CENTRE
Charity number: 1115850

Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ASHOK KHARE | Chair | 05 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
Dhiraj Gehlot | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Shashi Kumar Mawkin | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Khushboo Panwar | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUNIL MEHAN | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAXMAN CHOUHAN | Trustee | 05 August 2006 |
|
|||||
SRIKRISHNAN SRIRAM | Trustee | 05 August 2006 |
|
|
||||
BHUPENDRA SANKHLA | Trustee | 05 August 2006 |
|
|
||||
VIJAY MISTRY | Trustee | 05 August 2006 |
|
|
||||
GOVIND BHATTI | Trustee | 05 August 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.