THE KING'S CASTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PREACHING THE GOSPEL IN AND AROUND THE UK AND EUROPE. WE ARE ACTIVELY ENGAGED IN PREACHING AND TEACHING THE WORD OF GOD IN PRISONS IN THE UK. WE ARE ACTIVELY ENGAGED IN OPEN AIR OUTREACHES TO ALL PEOPLE OF THE UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Cambridgeshire
- Durham
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 17 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR BANJO ALFRED AKIN OLUWATULA | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
DR JOHN OCANSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev OLABODE AWOGBADE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.20k | £206.22k | £154.35k | £195.28k | £255.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.59k | £161.95k | £181.31k | £206.80k | £242.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £55.69k | £8.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
09 May 2022 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 16 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND B. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH. C. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE KING'S CASTLE CHURCH
UNIT 2
162 BRINKBURN STREET
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 2AR
- Phone:
- 07861661380
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window