Accounts and annual returns TURKISH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF BRISTOL AND THE SOUTH WEST

Charity number: 1115474
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 May 2024 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 15 May 2024 465 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 June 2021 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required