PENINSULA YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To employ and equip a youth worker team to work in Hundreds of Hoo school and on the Hoo Penninsula.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Medway
Governance
- 06 June 2006: Standard registration
- 19 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- P Y F C (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.91k | £17.16k | £31.76k | £21.83k | £14.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.27k | £23.75k | £32.80k | £35.98k | £18.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 20 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 03 July 2012 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 17 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 17 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 19 July 2010 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) ON THE HOO PENINSULA AND ITS ENVIRONS; (2) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) ON THE HOO PENINSULA AND ITS ENVIRONS; (3) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN LIVING; AND (4) TO WORK TOWARDS RELIEVING POVERTY AND SICKNESS THROUGH COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST
Area of benefit
HOO PENINSULA AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window