THE NATIONAL ENVIRONMENTAL GEOLOGY CENTRE FOR WALES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To set up and run a visitor centre based on local environmental and geological features.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2006: Standard registration
- 24 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE NATIONAL GEOPARK ENVIRONMENTAL CENTRE FOR WALES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, AND THE PEOPLE OF WALES IN PARTICULAR, BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF GEOLOGY, ECOLOGY AND THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY: 2.2.1 ESTABLISHING AND RUNNING A VISITORS AND RESEARCH CENTRE WITHIN THE UPPER SWANSEA VALLEY AND BRECON BEACONS NATIONAL PARK; 2.2.2 DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING A RANGE OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC; 2.2.3 PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESEARCH INTO THE STUDY OF GEOLOGY, ECOLOGY AND THE ENVIRONMENT; 2.2.4 PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL INITIATIVES CONCERNING THE HERITAGE OF WALES.
Area of benefit
PEOPLE OF WALES IN PARTICULAR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window