DROP4DROP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drop4drop is a charity supported by bottled drinks companies and actively uses donations from those companies and individuals to source and fund projects to provide clean drinking water in developing countries, through worldwide charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ethiopia
- India
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- South Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 13 July 2006: Standard registration
- DROP4DROP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Katie Barry | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
The Honourable Lucas White | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHRISTOPHER KONECKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND LEEK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.69k | £163.10k | £174.66k | £171.07k | £83.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.98k | £47.65k | £103.25k | £239.13k | £149.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £26.13k | £11.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.13k | £11.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF CLEAN WATER SUPPLIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTISE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 21
Mackley Industrial Estate
BN5 9XR
- Phone:
- 08452025433
- Email:
- info@drop4drop.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window