Deaf Experience Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Deaf Experience (DEXperience) is deaf user-led, aiming for the wellbeing of deaf children and young people, providing consultation, participation, training and research. DEX conducted a ground-breaking Best Value Review of deaf education from user perspective, establishing universal performance standards and works with national organisations towards legislation and policy change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £280 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 May 2006: Standard registration
- Deaf Experience (Working name)
- Deaf Experience Limited (Working name)
- DEAF EX-MAINSTREAMERS GROUP (Previous name)
- DEAF EX-MAINSTREAMERS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Deaf Experience (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Rice | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohsin Patel | Trustee | 27 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Falak Sher Adil | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN JONES- LEACH | Trustee | 23 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KHALID ASHRAF | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID CLAUDE LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN EDWARD RANDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.15k | £50.11k | £113.56k | £117.29k | £96.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.95k | £46.43k | £72.38k | £110.15k | £116.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £45.40k | N/A | £250 | £280 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 NOVEMBER 2005 as amended on 22 Jan 2022 as amended on 21 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DEAF PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A SERVICE CALCULATED TO ASSIST THEM TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deaf Experience Ltd
St. Marys Street
LEEDS
LS9 7DP
- Phone:
- 01132584855
- Email:
- contact@dex.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window