THE JOHN GUSH CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitate the participation in Youth Cricket
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 May 2006: Standard registration
- 27 June 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION OF YOUTH PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES, EDUCATION, COACHING OR EQUIPMENT FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO LIVE OR WERE BORN IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND ARE UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN AND OR OVER THAT AGE BUT AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES ("THE BENEFICIARIES") TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; 3.2 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO THE BENEFICIARIES TO FURTHER THE SPORT OF CRICKET.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window