Accounts and annual returns WEST WALES DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1116262
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 April 2023 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 December 2022 331 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 May 2023 484 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2022 696 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required